2013-2014 Interim
Legislative Commission (NRS 218E.150)

Summary 
The Legislative Commission supervises the Legislative Counsel Bureau. The Commission is a body of 12 legislators, six from each house. The Commission also takes actions on behalf of the legislative branch of government when the full Legislature is not in session. This body meets every few months between sessions to provide guidance to staff of the Legislative Counsel Bureau and to deal with other interim matters.

Agendas and Minutes

Sign up to Receive Committee Information

October 3, 2013 Meeting

October 22, 2013 Meeting

December 20, 2013 Meeting

February 25, 2014 Meeting

March 28, 2014 Meeting

June 23, 2014 Meeting