2013-2014 Interim
Interim Finance Committee (NRS 218E.400)

Summary 
The Interim Finance Committee functions within the Legislative Counsel Bureau between sessions and administers a contingency fund. The committee is composed of the members of the Senate Committee on Finance and the Assembly Committee on Ways and Means from the preceding session.

Agendas and Minutes

NOTE: The "Current Members" represent the composition of the Interim Finance Committee following the November 4, 2014 election. Assemblyman Paul Anderson will become Chair of the Interim Finance Committee pursuant to subsection 2 of NRS 218E.400 on February 2, 2015. Senator Ben Kieckhefer will become Vice Chair of the Interim Finance Committee pursuant to subsection 2 of NRS 218E.400 on February 2, 2015.



Sign up to Receive Committee Information

June 27, 2013 Meeting

August 6, 2013 Meeting

August 29, 2013 Meeting

October 22, 2013 Meeting

December 9, 2013 Meeting

February 6, 2014 Meeting

April 10, 2014 Meeting

June 19, 2014 Meeting

August 27, 2014 Meeting

October 22, 2014 Meeting

December 8, 2014 Meeting

January 22, 2015 Meeting

March 2, 2015 Meeting