2011-2012 Interim
Funding of Higher Education (S.B. 374)

Agendas and Minutes

Interim Study Report

August 29, 2012 Meeting

June 27, 2012 Meeting

May 23, 2012 Meeting

April 25, 2012 Meeting

February 29, 2012 Meeting

January 11, 2012 Meeting

November 29, 2011 Meeting