2011-2012 Interim
Committee on Industrial Programs (NRS 209.4817)

Summary 
The Committee on Industrial Programs is an ongoing statutory committee consisting of the Director of the Department of Corrections, the Chief of the Purchasing Division of the Department of Administration and eight regular members appointed by the Legislative Interim Finance Committee. The primary responsibilities of the Committee are set forth in Nevada Revised Statutes 209.4818. These responsibilities include a review of the operations of current and proposed industrial programs for correctional institutions within the Department of Corrections and to report to the Interim Finance Committee semiannually on the status of those programs.

Agendas and Minutes

October 22, 2012 Meeting

September 28, 2012 Meeting

June 25, 2012 Meeting

March 23, 2012 Meeting

December 16, 2011 Meeting

September 21, 2011 Meeting