2011-2012 Interim
Advisory Commission on the Administration of Justice (NRS 176.0123)

Agendas and Minutes

April 17, 2012 Meeting

Additional Documents of Interest

June 6, 2012 Meeting

July 17, 2012 Meeting

August 28, 2012 Meeting

October 10, 2012 Meeting

Summary of Final Recommendations

Final Report 2013

Work Session Document