State of the State Address, 1864-current


What we now refer to as the "State of the State Address" or "State of the State Speech" was once referred to more formally as the "Message of the Governor to the Legislature of Nevada," and is required by Article 5, Section 10, of the Constitution of the State of Nevada:

Sec: 10.  Governor's message.  He shall communicate by Message to the Legislature at every regular Session the condition of the State and recommend such measures as he may deem expedient[.]

Search for Governor Last Name or Year:  

   
  • Brian E. Sandoval, 2011-Current

    2011, 2013,
  • James A. "Jim" Gibbons, 2007-2011

    2007, 2009, 2010
  • Kenny C. Guinn, 1999-2007

    1999, 2001, 2003, 2005
  • Robert Joseph "Bob" Miller, 1989-1999

    1989, 1990 ,1991, 1993, 1995, 1997
  • Richard Hudson Bryan, 1983-1989

    1983, 1984, 1985, 1986, 1987
  • Robert Frank List, 1979-1983

    1979, 1981, 1982
  • Donal Neil "Mike" O'Callaghan, 1971-1979

    1971, 1973, 1975, 1977
  • Paul Dominique Laxalt, 1967-1971

    1967, 1969
  • Frank Grant Sawyer, 1959-1967

    1959, 1960, 1961, 1963, 1965
  • Charles Hinton Russell, 1951-1959

    1951, 1953, 1955, 1957
  • Vail Montgomery Pittman, 1945-1951

    1947, 1949
    • Acting Governor July 24, 1945, to January 6, 1947
  • Edward Peter Carville, 1939-1945

    1939, 1941, 1943, 1945
    • Resigned July 24, 1945; appointed to serve unexpired term of U.S. Senator Scrugham (deceased)
  • Richard Kirman, 1935-1939

    1935, 1937
  • Morley Isaac Griswold, 1934-1935

    • Acting Governor March 21, 1934, to January 7, 1935
  • Frederick Bennett Balzar, 1927-1934

    1927, 1929, 1931, 1933
  • James Graves Scrugham, 1923-1927

    1923, 1925
  • Emmet Derby Boyle, 1915-1923

    1915, 1917, 1919, 1921
  • Tasker Lowndes Oddie, 1911-1915

    1911, 1913, 1915
  • Denver Sylvester Dickerson, 1908-1911

    1909
    • Acting Governor May 22, 1908, to January 2, 1911
  • John Sparks, 1903-1908

    1903, 1905, 1907
  • Reinhold Sadler, 1896-1903

    1897, 1899, 1901, 1903
  • John Edward Jones, 1895-1896

    1895
    • Died April 10, 1896
  • Roswell Keyes Colcord, 1891-1895

    1893, 1895
  • Frank Bell, 1890-1891

    1891
    • Acting Governor September 1, 1890, to January 5, 1891
  • Charles Clark Stevenson, 1887-1890

    1887, 1889
    • Disability certificate September 1, 1890, died September 21, 1890
  • Jewett William Adams, 1883-1887

    1883, 1885, 1887
  • John Henry Kinkead, 1879-1883

    1879, 1881, 1883
  • Lewis Rice Bradley, 1871-1879

    1873, 1875, 1877, 1879
  • Henry Goode Blasdel, 1864-1871

    1864, 1866, 1867, 1869, 1871
  • James Warren Nye, 1861-1864


Sources:  Journal of the Senate, Journal of the Assembly, Appendices to the Journals of Senate and Assembly, Political History of Nevada (2006 ed.), Governors of the State of Nevada (Nevada State Library and Archives)

If you have any questions about the Research Division's web pages, please contact us.
  Last updated 1/27/2015