Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
Legend:
* The bill was introduced in the 74th Session.
** The bill was introduced in the 25th Special Session.

Veto Messages for the 75th (2009) Session

Messages from Governor Gibbons regarding 75th (2009) Session vetoed bills.

  AB396*
June 15, 2007
  SB146*
June 15, 2007
  AB122
May 21, 2009
  AB257
May 21, 2009
  AB480
May 21, 2009
  SB201
May 21, 2009
  AB121
May 23, 2009
  AB410
May 23, 2009
  AB119
May 25, 2009
  AB473
May 25, 2009
  SB283
May 25, 2009
  SB319
May 26, 2009
  SB394
May 26, 2009
  AB146
May 28, 2009
  AB246
May 28, 2009
  AB267
May 28, 2009
  AB307
May 28, 2009
  AB446
May 28, 2009
  AB458
May 28, 2009
  AB491
May 28, 2009
  AB493
May 28, 2009
  AB543
May 28, 2009
  AB552
May 28, 2009
  AB562
May 28, 2009
  AB563
May 28, 2009
  SB195
May 28, 2009
  SB234
May 28, 2009
  SB363
May 28, 2009
  SB378
May 28, 2009
  SB415
May 28, 2009
  SB429
May 28, 2009
  SB431
May 28, 2009
  SB433
May 28, 2009
  AB22
May 29, 2009
  AB25
May 29, 2009
  AB135
May 29, 2009
  AB141
May 29, 2009
  AB147
May 29, 2009
  AB304
May 29, 2009
  AB319
May 29, 2009
  AB381
May 29, 2009
  AB463
May 29, 2009
  AB467
May 29, 2009
  AB395
June 4, 2009
  SB376
June 4, 2009
  AB130
June 9, 2009
  AB451
June 9, 2009
  AB503
June 9, 2009
  SB143
June 9, 2009
  SB396
June 9, 2009



Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo