SB147
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 18, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Wiener , Care , McGinness , Copening , Schneider

Establishes provisions governing broadcasters during emergencies. (BDR 36-960)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 140.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Feb. 26, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation     Mar. 10, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr. 29, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Government Affairs     May. 12, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 08   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May. 13   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.85   

Bill History

Feb 18, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Energy, Infrastructure and Transportation. To printer.

Feb 19, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Mar 30, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 01, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 85.) To printer.

Apr 02, 2009

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 06, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 08, 2009

Apr 09, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 12, 2009

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 13, 2009

May 15, 2009

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 17, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 22, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 140.
  • Effective May 22, 2009.