SB125
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 10, 2009.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks , Wiener , Schneider , Breeden , Care , Coffin , Copening , Horsford , Lee , Mathews , Woodhouse , Pierce , Anderson , Grady , Hardy , Hogan , Koivisto , Segerblom , Spiegel

Makes changes relating to personal identifying information. (BDR 15-481)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 205.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb. 23, 2009     09:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 12, 2009     08:30 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 04, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 08, 2009     08:00 AM    Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May. 18, 2009     04:02 PM    Minutes          Concur

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr. 13   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May. 16   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No.48     Amend. No.645   

Bill History

Feb 10, 2009

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Feb 11, 2009

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 06, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 08, 2009

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 48.) To printer.

Apr 09, 2009

Apr 13, 2009

Apr 14, 2009

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 12, 2009

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 645.) To printer.

May 13, 2009

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2009

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2009

May 18, 2009

  • In Senate.

May 19, 2009

  • Assembly Amendment No. 645 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 20, 2009

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2009

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 205.
  • Effective October 1, 2009.