Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

Conference Committees

Name
Hearing Date
Hearing Time
Hearing Location
Conference Committee On AB24 May 31, 2009 08: 00 AM Room 1113B
Conference Committee On AB46 May 28, 2009 09: 30 AM Room 1113B
Conference Committee On AB52 May 30, 2009 10: 00 AM Room 3143
Conference Committee On AB60 May 30, 2009 02: 45 PM Room 3142
Conference Committee On AB84 May 31, 2009 09: 00 AM Room 1113B
Conference Committee On AB88 May 31, 2009 04: 00 PM Room 3161
Conference Committee On AB130 May 30, 2009 03: 00 PM Room 3161
Conference Committee On AB140 May 29, 2009 01: 00 PM Room 3161
Conference Committee On AB202 May 30, 2009 08: 45 AM Room 3161
Conference Committee On AB223 Jun 01, 2009 01: 45 PM Room 1113B
Conference Committee On AB259 May 28, 2009 08: 30 AM Room 3143
Conference Committee On AB309 May 29, 2009 03: 30 PM Room 3143
Conference Committee On AB320 May 30, 2009 02: 00 PM Room 3161
Conference Committee On AB350 May 31, 2009 09: 30 AM Room 3161
Conference Committee On AB385
Conference Committee On AB454 May 30, 2009 10: 30 AM Room 3138
Conference Committee On AB463
Conference Committee On AB523 Jun 01, 2009 08: 00 AM Room 1113B
Conference Committee On AB561 May 31, 2009 04: 00 PM Room 1113B
Conference Committee On SB17 May 27, 2009 04: 00 PM Room 3161
Conference Committee On SB35 May 31, 2009 09: 30 AM Room 3142
Conference Committee On SB45 May 22, 2009 09: 00 AM Room 3161
Conference Committee On SB54 May 26, 2009 01: 00 PM Room 3161
Conference Committee On SB55 May 30, 2009 01: 30 PM Room 1113B
Conference Committee On SB68 May 30, 2009 02: 30 PM Room 3143
Conference Committee On SB101 May 28, 2009 09: 00 AM Room 3161
Conference Committee On SB109 May 18, 2009 01: 15 PM Room 3161
Conference Committee On SB119 May 29, 2009 04: 00 PM Room 1113B
Conference Committee On SB182 May 31, 2009 01: 30 PM Room 1113B
Conference Committee On SB183 May 30, 2009 03: 00 PM Room 3142
Conference Committee On SB218 May 27, 2009 04: 00 PM Room 1113B
Conference Committee On SB242 Jun 01, 2009 05: 15 PM Room 1113B
Conference Committee On SB246
Conference Committee On SB263 Jun 01, 2009 03: 00 PM Room 3161
Conference Committee On SB269 May 30, 2009 09: 30 AM Room 1113B
Conference Committee On SB293
Conference Committee On SB295 May 31, 2009 01: 30 PM Room 1219
Conference Committee On SB305 May 28, 2009 10: 00 AM Room 3161
Conference Committee On SB332 May 30, 2009 01: 30 PM Room 3161
Conference Committee On SB389 May 27, 2009 01: 00 PM Room 3161
Conference Committee On SB403 Jun 01, 2009 12: 00 PM Room 3161
Conference Committee On SB411 May 31, 2009 10: 30 AM Room 3143

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo