Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

Senate Joint Resolutions for the 75th (2009) Session

Display Bills:       Enter Search Text:
Legend:
* The bill was introduced in the 74th Session.
** The bill was introduced in the 25th Special Session.
Return to the 75th (2009) Session Bill Information Page
There are 15 bills listed.

Change Scroll Feature
SJR1* Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to remove requirements concerning affidavits that must be affixed to referendum petitions and initiative petitions. (BDR C-688)
  Introduced On: Feb 02, 2009
  By: Legislative Operations and Elections
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 11, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
SJR2* Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions relating to the selection of justices and judges. (BDR C-177)
  Introduced On: Feb 02, 2009
  By: Titus      Raggio      Hardy      Care      Coffin      Carlton      Amodei      Mathews      Nolan      Townsend     
  Most Recent History Action: May 22, 2009 - File No. 87.
SJR3* Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise certain provisions relating to elections. (BDR C-260).
  Introduced On: Feb 02, 2009
  By: Rhoads      Amodei      McGinness     
  Most Recent History Action: Jun 02, 2009 - (No further action taken.)
SJR4* Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to require the Legislature to provide for the organization and duties of the Board of Regents and the appointment of its members by the Governor. (BDR C-1087)
  Introduced On: Feb 02, 2009
  By: Raggio      Townsend      Nolan     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 22, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
SJR9* Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to allow the Legislature to establish an intermediate appellate court. (BDR C-661)
  Introduced On: Feb 02, 2009
  By: Judiciary
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 29, 2009 - File No. 57.
SJR1 Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to replace the State Board of Pardons Commissioners with the Clemency Board and to require the Legislature to provide for the organization and duties of the Clemency Board. (BDR C-552)
  Introduced On: Jan 23, 2009
  By: Parks     
  Most Recent History Action: May 22, 2009 - File No. 80.
SJR2 Urges Congress to take certain actions concerning wilderness areas and wilderness study areas. (BDR R-604)
  Introduced On: Feb 09, 2009
  By: Natural Resources
  Most Recent History Action: May 22, 2009 - File No. 83.
SJR3 Urges the Federal Aviation Administration and the Clark County Department of Aviation to convene a stakeholders' group to develop and make recommendations to improve flight safety standards at the North Las Vegas Airport, particularly with respect to experimental homebuilt aircraft. (BDR R-803)
  Introduced On: Feb 09, 2009
  By: Horsford      Kirkpatrick     
  Most Recent History Action: May 22, 2009 - File No. 84.
SJR4 Urges Congress to fund fully and protect the Medicare program. (BDR R-785)
  Introduced On: Feb 16, 2009
  By: Legislative Operations and Elections
  Most Recent History Action: May 22, 2009 - File No. 85.
SJR5 Urges the President and Congress to continue to support the participation of the Republic of China on Taiwan in the World Health Organization. (BDR R-1013)
  Introduced On: Mar 10, 2009
  By: Legislative Operations and Elections
  Most Recent History Action: Mar 13, 2009 - File No. 28.
SJR6 Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to provide for a 30-day legislative session in even-numbered years to consider budgetary matters. (BDR C-107)
  Introduced On: Mar 13, 2009
  By: Woodhouse      Horsford      Parks      Breeden      Copening      Schneider     
  Most Recent History Action: Jun 02, 2009 - (No further action taken.)
SJR7 Expresses opposition to congressional enactment of the National Landscape Conservation System. (BDR R-983)
  Introduced On: Mar 16, 2009
  By: Rhoads     
  Most Recent History Action: May 16, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
SJR8 Urges Congress to preserve the traditional power of the states over land and water use. (BDR R-984)
  Introduced On: Mar 16, 2009
  By: Rhoads     
  Most Recent History Action: May 16, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
SJR9 Urges Congress to revise certain provisions of federal law relating to hybrid vehicles. (BDR R-1065)
  Introduced On: Mar 16, 2009
  By: Schneider     
  Most Recent History Action: May 22, 2009 - File No. 86.
SJR10 Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to remove term limits for certain public officers. (BDR C-665)
  Introduced On: Mar 16, 2009
  By: Washington     
  Most Recent History Action: Jun 02, 2009 - (No further action taken.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo