Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

Assembly Joint Resolutions for the 75th (2009) Session

Display Bills:       Enter Search Text:
Legend:
* The bill was introduced in the 74th Session.
** The bill was introduced in the 25th Special Session.
Return to the 75th (2009) Session Bill Information Page
Click Here to view the Definitions used for Bills in Committee
AFTER PASSAGE DISCUSSION: discussion of a measure by the committee at a subsequent meeting after which the committee had taken action to recommend passage/adoption of the measure.

MENTIONED, NO JURISDICTION: discussion of a measure not referred to the committee (not within the jurisdiction).

DISCUSSION ONLY: discussion of a measure that has been referred (within the jurisdiction of the committee) to the committee but is not on the day's agenda to be heard; or discussion of a measure during a work session when no other action is taken on the measure.

DISCUSSED AS BDR: discussion of a proposed measure by the committee prior to approving it be introduced as a bill.
There are 17 bills listed.

Change Scroll Feature
AJR3* Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions relating to the taking of private property by eminent domain. (BDR C-529)
  Introduced On: Feb 02, 2009
  By: Anderson      Carpenter      Mortenson      Parks      Hardy      Raggio      Lee      Townsend      Hardy      Buckley      Ohrenschall      Horne      Gansert      Allen      Arberry      Atkinson      Beers      Bobzien      Christensen      Claborn      Cobb      Conklin      Denis      Goedhart      Goicoechea      Grady      Hogan      Kihuen      Kirkpatrick      Mabey      Manendo      Marvel      McClain      Munford      Oceguera      Parnell      Pierce      Segerblom      Settelmeyer      Smith      Stewart      Weber      Womack      Care      Heck      Cegavske      Beers      Coffin      Horsford      Mathews      McGinness      Nolan      Schneider      Washington      Wiener      Woodhouse      Koivisto     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 16, 2009 - File No. 51.
AJR1 Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise the provisions governing a petition for a state initiative or referendum. (BDR C-710)
  Introduced On: Feb 17, 2009
  By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
  Most Recent History Action: Jun 02, 2009 - File No. 98.
AJR2 Revises provisions governing the approval of certain initiative petitions. (BDR C-883)
  Introduced On: Feb 20, 2009
  By: Goedhart      Christensen      Cobb      Goicoechea      Grady      Gustavson      Hambrick      Settelmeyer      Stewart     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 11, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
AJR3 Ratifies proposed constitutional amendment relative to equal rights for men and women. (BDR R-793)
  Introduced On: Mar 09, 2009
  By: McClain      Pierce      Parnell      Koivisto      Spiegel      Anderson      Buckley      Claborn      Conklin      Dondero Loop      Hogan      Kihuen      Kirkpatrick      Leslie      Manendo      Mastroluca      Munford      Segerblom      Smith      Parks      Carlton      Copening      Breeden      Horsford      Wiener      Woodhouse     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 11, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
AJR4 Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to provide for tax rebates for certain eligible pupils who attend private schools. (BDR C-882)
  Introduced On: Mar 10, 2009
  By: Goedhart      Cobb      Goicoechea      Grady      Gustavson      Hambrick      Settelmeyer      Stewart     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 11, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
AJR5 Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions governing the convening and conduct of special sessions and the duration and adjournment of regular and special sessions. (BDR C-139)
  Introduced On: Mar 11, 2009
  By: Mortenson      Ohrenschall      Horne      Kihuen      Segerblom     
  Most Recent History Action: May 26, 2009 - File No. 92.
AJR6 Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise provisions concerning legislative sessions. (BDR C-67)
  Introduced On: Mar 12, 2009
  By: Segerblom      Ohrenschall      Koivisto      Buckley      McClain      Aizley      Anderson      Arberry      Atkinson      Claborn      Denis      Goicoechea      Hogan      Horne      Kihuen      Manendo      Mastroluca      Mortenson      Munford      Oceguera      Pierce      Settelmeyer      Smith      Horsford      Coffin      Schneider      Breeden      Hardy      Woodhouse     
  Most Recent History Action: Jun 02, 2009 - (No further action taken.)
AJR7 Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to repeal provisions relating to lotteries. (BDR C-1040)
  Introduced On: Mar 16, 2009
  By: Aizley      McClain      Kirkpatrick      Koivisto      Buckley      Arberry      Atkinson      Bobzien      Claborn      Conklin      Dondero Loop      Goicoechea      Grady      Hogan      Horne      Kihuen      Mortenson      Munford      Ohrenschall      Parnell      Pierce      Segerblom      Smith     
  Most Recent History Action: May 16, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)
AJR8 Urges Congress to repeal certain provisions of the Voting Rights Act of 1965. (BDR R-936)
  Introduced On: Mar 16, 2009
  By: McArthur     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 11, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
AJR9 Requests that the Nevada Congressional Delegation oppose legislation which disenfranchises workers by removing their right to a private ballot union election. (BDR R-1090)
  Introduced On: Mar 16, 2009
  By: McArthur     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 11, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
AJR10 Urges Congress to enact legislation requiring the Secretary of the Interior to convey ownership of certain land to the State of Nevada for the development of projects for renewable energy. (BDR R-686)
  Introduced On: Mar 16, 2009
  By: Buckley     
  Most Recent History Action: May 15, 2009 - File No. 74.
AJR11 Urges Congress to implement the Homeowners and Bank Protection Act of 2007. (BDR R-850)
  Introduced On: Mar 16, 2009
  By: Koivisto      Arberry      Munford     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 11, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
AJR12 Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution by adding the provisions of the Tax and Spending Control for Nevada initiative. (BDR C-1042)
  Introduced On: Mar 16, 2009
  By: Cobb      Goedhart      Gustavson      Grady      McArthur      Settelmeyer     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 11, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
AJR13 Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise the procedure for reapportioning legislative districts. (BDR C-678)
  Introduced On: Mar 16, 2009
  By: Gansert      Hardy      Stewart      Grady      Hambrick     
  Most Recent History Action: Jun 02, 2009 - (No further action taken.)
AJR14 Urges the United States Environmental Protection Agency to grant California a waiver to achieve certain reductions in greenhouse gas emissions from motor vehicles. (BDR R-5)
  Introduced On: Mar 16, 2009
  By: Ohrenschall      Bobzien      Segerblom      Leslie      Hogan      Aizley      Arberry      Goedhart      Goicoechea      Kihuen      Mortenson      Munford      Oceguera      Pierce      Parks     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 22, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
AJR15 Claims sovereignty under the Tenth Amendment to the U.S. Constitution. (BDR R-731)
  Introduced On: Mar 16, 2009
  By: Goicoechea      Settelmeyer      Grady      Carpenter      Ohrenschall      Christensen      Cobb      Gansert      Goedhart      Gustavson      Hambrick      Hardy      McArthur      Stewart     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 11, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
AJR16 Proposes to amend the Nevada Constitution to revise the provisions governing a petition for a state initiative or referendum. (BDR C-1240)
  Introduced On: Mar 23, 2009
  By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 11, 2009 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo