Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

Senate Resolutions for the 75th (2009) Session

Display Bills:       Enter Search Text:
Legend:
* The bill was introduced in the 74th Session.
** The bill was introduced in the 25th Special Session.
Return to the 75th (2009) Session Bill Information Page
There are 11 bills listed.

Change Scroll Feature
SR1 Adopts the Standing Rules of the Senate for the 75th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-966)
  Introduced On: Feb 02, 2009
  By: Horsford      Raggio     
  Most Recent History Action: Feb 05, 2009 - File No. 1.
SR2 Provides allowances for periodicals, stamps, stationery and communications. (BDR R-968)
  Introduced On: Feb 02, 2009
  By: Horsford      Raggio     
  Most Recent History Action: Feb 05, 2009 - File No. 2.
SR3 Provides for the appointment of the Senate attaches. (BDR R-967)
  Introduced On: Feb 02, 2009
  By: Legislative Operations and Elections
  Most Recent History Action: Feb 05, 2009 - File No. 3.
SR4 Provides for the appointment of an additional attache for the Senate. (BDR R-1242)
  Introduced On: Feb 25, 2009
  By: Legislative Operations and Elections
  Most Recent History Action: Feb 27, 2009 - File No. 17.
SR5 Memorializes Robert L. McDonald, Reno attorney and community leader. (BDR R-899)
  Introduced On: Mar 24, 2009
  By: Care      Amodei      Breeden      Carlton      Cegavske      Coffin      Copening      Hardy      Horsford      Lee      Mathews      McGinness      Nolan      Parks      Raggio      Rhoads      Schneider      Townsend      Washington      Wiener      Woodhouse     
  Most Recent History Action: Mar 26, 2009 - File No. 35.
SR6 Inducts Charles D. Gallagher into the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1273)
  Introduced On: Apr 14, 2009
  By: Horsford      Raggio      Amodei      Breeden      Care      Carlton      Cegavske      Coffin      Copening      Hardy      Lee      Mathews      McGinness      Nolan      Parks      Rhoads      Schneider      Townsend      Washington      Wiener      Woodhouse     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 16, 2009 - File No. 52.
SR7 Inducts Dina Titus into the Senate Hall of Fame. (BDR R-1274)
  Introduced On: Apr 14, 2009
  By: Horsford      Raggio      Amodei      Breeden      Care      Carlton      Cegavske      Coffin      Copening      Hardy      Lee      Mathews      McGinness      Nolan      Parks      Rhoads      Schneider      Townsend      Washington      Wiener      Woodhouse     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 16, 2009 - File No. 53.
SR8 Honors the accomplishments of Steve Fossett. (BDR R-615)
  Introduced On: May 06, 2009
  By: Coffin      Amodei      Breeden      Care      Carlton      Cegavske      Copening      Hardy      Horsford      Lee      Mathews      McGinness      Nolan      Parks      Raggio      Rhoads      Schneider      Townsend      Washington      Wiener      Woodhouse     
  Most Recent History Action: May 11, 2009 - File No. 62.
SR9 Amends Senate Standing Rule Nos. 68 and 115 for the 75th Session of the Legislature to allow the Senate to vote on a motion to reconsider the vote on a bill or resolution on the same day the motion is made. (BDR R-1327)
  Introduced On: May 20, 2009
  By: Legislative Operations and Elections
  Most Recent History Action: May 22, 2009 - File No. 81.
SR10 Expresses and explains the public policy governing Rule No. 23 of the Standing Rules of the Senate for the 75th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-1324)
  Introduced On: May 20, 2009
  By: Legislative Operations and Elections
  Most Recent History Action: May 22, 2009 - File No. 82.
SR11 Designates Senate members of the Legislative Commission for the 2009-2011 biennium. (BDR R-1330)
  Introduced On: May 28, 2009
  By: Legislative Operations and Elections
  Most Recent History Action: Jun 01, 2009 - File No. 94.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo