Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag

Assembly Resolutions for the 75th (2009) Session

Display Bills:       Enter Search Text:
Legend:
* The bill was introduced in the 74th Session.
** The bill was introduced in the 25th Special Session.
Return to the 75th (2009) Session Bill Information Page
Click Here to view the Definitions used for Bills in Committee
AFTER PASSAGE DISCUSSION: discussion of a measure by the committee at a subsequent meeting after which the committee had taken action to recommend passage/adoption of the measure.

MENTIONED, NO JURISDICTION: discussion of a measure not referred to the committee (not within the jurisdiction).

DISCUSSION ONLY: discussion of a measure that has been referred (within the jurisdiction of the committee) to the committee but is not on the day's agenda to be heard; or discussion of a measure during a work session when no other action is taken on the measure.

DISCUSSED AS BDR: discussion of a proposed measure by the committee prior to approving it be introduced as a bill.
There are 12 bills listed.

Change Scroll Feature
AR1 Adopts the Assembly Standing Rules for the 75th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-969)
  Introduced On: Feb 02, 2009
  By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
  Most Recent History Action: Feb 06, 2009 - File No. 5.
AR2 Provides for the appointment of Assembly attaches. (BDR R-970)
  Introduced On: Feb 02, 2009
  By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
  Most Recent History Action: Feb 06, 2009 - File No. 6.
AR3 Provides allowances to the leadership and other members of the Assembly for periodicals, stamps, stationery and communications. (BDR R-971)
  Introduced On: Feb 02, 2009
  By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
  Most Recent History Action: Feb 06, 2009 - File No. 7.
AR4 Provides for the appointment of an additional attache for the Assembly. (BDR R-1267)
  Introduced On: Mar 11, 2009
  By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
  Most Recent History Action: Mar 13, 2009 - File No. 27.
AR5 Adds William D. Swackhamer to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1270)
  Introduced On: Mar 18, 2009
  By: Buckley      Oceguera      Gansert     
  Most Recent History Action: Mar 20, 2009 - File No. 32.
AR6 Adds John W. Marvel to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1271)
  Introduced On: Mar 18, 2009
  By: Buckley      Oceguera      Gansert     
  Most Recent History Action: Mar 20, 2009 - File No. 33.
AR7 Adds Kimberly Ann Morgan to the Assembly Wall of Distinction. (BDR R-1272)
  Introduced On: Mar 18, 2009
  By: Buckley      Oceguera      Gansert     
  Most Recent History Action: Mar 20, 2009 - File No. 34.
AR8 Provides for the appointment of an additional attache for the Assembly. (BDR R-1282)
  Introduced On: Mar 27, 2009
  By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 01, 2009 - File No. 39.
AR9 Expresses appreciation to the Chief Clerk and staff of the Assembly. (BDR R-1031)
  Introduced On: Apr 23, 2009
  By: Buckley      Aizley      Anderson      Arberry      Atkinson      Bobzien      Carpenter      Christensen      Claborn      Cobb      Conklin      Denis      Dondero Loop      Gansert      Goedhart      Goicoechea      Grady      Gustavson      Hambrick      Hardy      Hogan      Horne      Kihuen      Kirkpatrick      Koivisto      Leslie      Manendo      Mastroluca      McArthur      McClain      Mortenson      Munford      Oceguera      Ohrenschall      Parnell      Pierce      Segerblom      Settelmeyer      Smith      Spiegel      Stewart      Woodbury     
  Most Recent History Action: Apr 28, 2009 - File No. 54.
AR10 Expresses and explains the public policy governing Rule No. 23 of the Standing Rules of the Assembly for the 75th Session of the Legislature. (BDR R-1325)
  Introduced On: May 20, 2009
  By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
  Most Recent History Action: May 22, 2009 - File No. 88.
AR11 Amends Assembly Standing Rule Nos. 68 and 115 for the 75th Session of the Legislature to allow the Assembly to vote on a motion to reconsider the vote on a bill or resolution on the same day the motion is made. (BDR R-1326)
  Introduced On: May 21, 2009
  By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
  Most Recent History Action: May 22, 2009 - File No. 90.
AR12 Designates Assembly members of the Legislative Commission for the 2009-2011 biennium. (BDR R-1329)
  Introduced On: May 28, 2009
  By: Elections, Procedures, Ethics, and Constitutional Amendments
  Most Recent History Action: Jun 01, 2009 - File No. 93.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo