Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB275
Introduced on: Mar 13, 2007
By: Natural Resources
Makes various changes relating to underground water. (BDR 48-208)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 246.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar. 28, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr. 11, 2007     03:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May. 14, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May. 16, 2007     01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 23   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.347
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.811

Bill History

Mar 13, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 14, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 347.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

Apr 23, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 21, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 811.) To printer.

May 22, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 24, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 25, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 811 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 28, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 246.
  • Effective January 1, 2008.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo