Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB237
Introduced on: Mar 07, 2007
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Lee , Hardy , Beers , Settelmeyer
Revises certain provisions governing permits to carry concealed firearms. (BDR 15-47)
Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 521.

Upcoming Hearings
       
Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar. 21, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Senate Judiciary     Apr. 04, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 09, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      No Action .
  Assembly Judiciary     May. 18, 2007     08:00 AM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended .
  Senate Judiciary     May. 25, 2007     09:00 AM    Minutes      Concur .
       
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr. 23   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May. 23   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text  As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint                 As Enrolled        
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.165
Adopted Amendments Amend. No.887

Bill History

Mar 07, 2007

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 08, 2007

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2007

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 19, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 165.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2007

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.

Apr 23, 2007

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 24, 2007

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 22, 2007

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 887.) To printer.

May 23, 2007

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate.

May 24, 2007

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2007

  • Assembly Amendment No. 887 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 31, 2007

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 14, 2007

  • Approved by the Governor.

Jun 15, 2007

  • Chapter 521.
  • Effective October 1, 2007.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo