Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB367
Introduced on: Mar 28, 2005
By: Human Resources and Education
Revises provisions governing education of suspended and expelled pupils. (BDR 34-617)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 396.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr-08-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Do pass.
  Assembly Education     May-02-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Education     May-18-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-30-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Do not concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-14   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-25   Yea 33,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.302 Amend. No.838 Amend. No.CA13

Bill History

Mar 28, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To printer.

Mar 29, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2005

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 12, 2005

  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 302.) To printer.

Apr 14, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.

Apr 15, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 23, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 24, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 838.) To printer.

May 25, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 33, Nays: 9.) To Senate.

May 26, 2005

  • In Senate.

May 31, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 838 not concurred in. To Assembly.

Jun 01, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 838 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 02, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 05, 2005

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 838 and further amend.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 06, 2005

  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 13, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 396.
  • Effective July 1, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo