Nevada Legislature Header Graphic Home -
NELIS -
Search -
View Scheduled Meetings -
Spacer
Battle Born Flag
SB221
Introduced on: Mar 21, 2005
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cegavske
Revises provisions governing interscholastic activities. (BDR 341158)
Fiscal Notes View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 503.

Upcoming Hearings
    
Past Hearings
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Mar-30-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      No Action.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     Apr-13-2005 01:30 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Education     May-09-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Pending.
  Assembly Education     May-20-2005 03:45 PM    Minutes      Amend, and do pass as amended.
  Assembly Education     May-25-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Discussion only.
  Senate Human Resources and Education     May-30-2005 Upon Adjournment    Minutes      Do not concur.
    
 
Votes
  Senate Final Passage    Apr-25   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 39,   Nay 2,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
  Assembly Final Passage    May-27   Yea 35,   Nay 6,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
 
Bill Text As Introduced     1st Reprint         2nd Reprint     3rd Reprint             As Enrolled        
Amendments Amend. No.350 Amend. No.928 Amend. No.CA48

Bill History

Mar 21, 2005

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Human Resources and Education. To printer.

Mar 22, 2005

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 21, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 22, 2005

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 350.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2005

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly.

Apr 26, 2005

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

May 26, 2005

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 928.) To printer.

May 27, 2005

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 39, Nays: 2, Excused: 1.)
  • Action of passage rescinded.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 35, Nays: 6, Excused: 1.)
  • To Senate.

May 30, 2005

  • In Senate.

May 31, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 928 not concurred in. To Assembly.

Jun 01, 2005

  • In Assembly.

Jun 04, 2005

  • Assembly Amendment No. 928 not receded from. Conference requested. First Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 05, 2005

  • In Senate.
  • First Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 06, 2005

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 928 and further amend.
  • First Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • First Conference report adopted by Assembly.

Jun 07, 2005

  • To printer.

Jun 15, 2005

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint.

Jun 16, 2005

  • To enrollment.

Jun 17, 2005

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 503.
  • Effective June 17, 2005.

Horizontal Rule Bar
Session Info | Current NELIS | Previous NELIS | Interim Info | Law Library | General Info | Counsel Bureau | Research Library | Assembly | Senate | FAQs  
View Scheduled Meetings | Publications | Proposals | Career Opportunities | Gift Shop | Site Map | Contact Us  


© 2014 Nevada Legislative Counsel Bureau
Nevada LCB Logo